EP4045442 - VISION-ASSISTED ROBOTIZED DEPALLETIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbotic Canada, ULC 10925, Boulevard Louis-H Lafontaine Montreal, Québec H1J 2E8 / CA | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Christian 10925 Boulevard Louis-H. Lafontaine Montreal, Ontario H1J 2E8 / CA | 02 /
MORENCY, Sylvain-Paul 10925 Boulevard Louis-H. Lafontaine Montreal, Québec H1J 2E8 / CA | 03 /
LÉGARÉ, William 10925 Boulevard Louis-H. Lafontaine Montreal, Québec H1J 2E8 / CA | 04 /
LAROUCHE, Benoit 10925 Boulevard Louis-H. Lafontaine Montreal, Québec H1J 2E8 / CA | 05 /
JODOIN, Robert 10925 Boulevard Louis-H. Lafontaine Montreal, Québec H1J 2E8 / CA | 06 /
CONRAD, Juergen 7 Empire Drive North An dover, Massachusetts 01845 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Ipside 7-9 Allées Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20875952.2 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020CA51387 | Priority number, date | US201962916080P | 16.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962916080 P | US202017070753 | 14.10.2020 Original published format: US202017070753 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021072545 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045442 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G59/02, B65G61/00, B25J9/16 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B25J9/1697 (EP,KR,US);
B65G59/023 (EP,KR);
B65G61/00 (EP,KR,US);
B25J13/08 (KR);
B25J19/023 (KR);
B25J9/1687 (EP,KR);
B65G2201/02 (KR);
B65G2201/0267 (US);
B65G2203/0208 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | B65G59/02, B65G61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VISIONSUNTERSTÜTZTER ROBOTISIERTER ENTPALETTIERER | [2022/34] | English: | VISION-ASSISTED ROBOTIZED DEPALLETIZER | [2022/34] | French: | DÉPALETTISEUR ROBOTISÉ ASSISTÉ PAR VISION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010026491 (WICKS MATTHEW R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040]; figures 1, 4 *; | [Y]US2017246744 (CHITTA SACHIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* See Fig. 1 to 3 and the corresponding text from the description, in particular paragraphs [0038] to [0040] * | International search | [A]US2007248448 (STARZ REINER [DE]) [A] 1-35 *Whole document*; | [A]US8096404 (ESCHLBECK RICHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-35*Whole document*; | [A]US10343857 (MORENCY SYLVAIN-PAUL [CA], et al) [A] 1-35 *Whole document* |