EP4045154 - DRY SPRINKLER ASSEMBLIES FOR FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minimax Viking Patent Management GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Minimax Viking Research & Development GmbH Industriestraße 10/12 23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Andrew T. 1375 River Road Hastings, MI 49058 / US | 02 /
PLEYTE, Gary William 1832 Briar Hill Dr. Hastings, MI 49058 / US | 03 /
COUPAL, Sylvain 510 20E Av, Saint-Jerome QC J7Z3W9 / CA | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20876003.3 | 18.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US56212 | Priority number, date | US201962916630P | 17.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962916630 P | US202062957676P | 06.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062957676 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077060 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045154 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/62, A62C37/08, A62C3/00, A62C37/12, A62C37/14, A62C37/09 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A62C3/004 (EP);
A62C35/62 (EP);
A62C37/09 (EP);
A62C37/12 (EP);
A62C37/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | A62C37/08, A62C35/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | TROCKENSPRINKLERANLAGEN FÜR BRANDSCHUTZSPRINKLERANLAGEN | [2022/34] | English: | DRY SPRINKLER ASSEMBLIES FOR FIRE PROTECTION SPRINKLER SYSTEMS | [2022/34] | French: | ENSEMBLES D'EXTINCTEURS SECS POUR SYSTÈMES D'EXTINCTEUR DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'INCENDIE | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 08.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2006113093 (SILVA MANUEL R JR [US]) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,11,12 * figures 1-2 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [ 0026] - [0027] - [ 0031] , [ 0034] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0037] , [ 0041] , [ 0044] , [ 0048] - [0049] * [A] 3,6,7,13-15[I] 2,10; | [XAI]WO2007095213 (VIKING CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,11,12 * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0030] - [0031] - [0033] - [0034] - [0044] * [A] 3,6,7,13-15 [I] 2,10 | International search | [XYA]US7766252 (JACKSON ELDON D [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 10, 19-20, 36-39, 40/(36-39), 41/(40/(36- 39)), 53-57, 63, 65-67, 70 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, 3-4, col. 3 ln. 24, 26-28, 30-31, 36-38, col. 4 ln. 6-8 * [Y] 72 [A] 6-9, 11-18, 21-25, 26/(21- 25), 42/(40/(36-39), 58- 62, 64, 68-69, 71, 73; | [Y]US2011000685 (MATSUOKA GENGO [JP]) [Y] 72 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1, para [0078] *; | [A]US8636075 (FRANSON SCOTT T [US], et al) [A] 1-25, 26/(21-25), 36-39,40/(36-39), (41-42)/(40/(36-39)), 53-73* , entire document *; | [A]US2017056697 (SILVA JR MANUEL R [US]) [A] 1-25, 26/(21-25), 36-39,40/(36-39), (41-42)/(40/(36-39)), 53-73 * , entire document * |