EP4045734 - A SAFETY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greenwich Innovation 10 Portview Place Burraneer, NSW 2230 / AU | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEKURI, Glen Laai 160 Second Avenue West Hoxton, New South Wales 2171 / AU | 02 /
BULMER, Chris 10 Portview Place Burraneer, New South Wales 2230 / AU | 03 /
PARATUA, Mafiata 26 Truro Parade Padstow, New South Wales 2211 / AU | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20876369.8 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020AU51114 | Priority number, date | AU20190903918 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: AU 2019903918 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021072499 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045734 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04G5/00, E04G5/04, E04G5/02, E04G1/02, E04G7/02, G08B21/02, E04G7/32, G08B29/04 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
E04G1/02 (EP,AU);
G08B21/02 (AU,US);
E04G5/002 (EP,AU,US);
E04G5/00 (EP);
E04G5/025 (EP,AU,US);
E04G5/04 (EP);
E04G7/02 (EP,AU);
E04G7/32 (EP);
G08B21/18 (AU);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | E04G5/00, E04G5/04, E04G5/02, E04G1/02, E04G7/02, G05B19/048, G08B21/02, G01R17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSYSTEM | [2022/34] | English: | A SAFETY SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 10.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN103883118 (RES INST HIGHWAY MINI TRANSP) [X] 1,2,6,9 * automated translation;; figures 1-6; claims 1,2 * [I] 2,4,5,7,8; | [XI]WO2015070312 (LAM CHI HUNG LOUIS [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-15 * [I] 3,7; | [XI]CN107975223 (JINJIANG MORNING CHIP ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6,9 * automated translation;; figures 1-6; claims 1,2,3 * [I] 2,4,5,8; | [XI]DK201700356 (USS UNIVERSAL SAFETY SYSTEMS [DK]) [X] 1-6,9 * page 6, line 14 - page 33, line 13; figures 1-12 * [I] 7,8; | [E]WO2021003556 (LAM RONALD CHUN YU [CN], et al) [E] 1-6,9* paragraph [0036]; figures 6a-12 * | International search | [X]WO2015070312 (LAM CHI HUNG LOUIS [CN], et al) [X] 1-9* Abstract, [0019], [0055] and Figures 1, 6, 8-10 * |