EP4046978 - CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takeshi c/o IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome, Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Hiroto c/o IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 03 /
KOTANI, Masahiro c/o IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | 04 /
SHINOHARA, Takahiko c/o IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20876596.6 | 13.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020JP38551 | Priority number, date | JP20190190326 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019190326 | [2022/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021075411 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046978 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B35/84, C04B35/18, C04B35/44, C04B35/653, C04B35/16 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (US);
C04B35/16 (EP);
C04B35/18 (EP);
C04B35/44 (EP);
C04B35/62665 (US);
C04B35/653 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/616 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/6586 (EP);
C04B2235/764 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | C04B35/80, C04B35/84 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | KERAMIKMATRIX-VERBUNDSTOFF UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/34] | English: | CERAMIC MATRIX COMPOSITE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/34] | French: | COMPOSITE À MATRICE CÉRAMIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | Translation filed | 17.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 02.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000007453 (UBE INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [A]DE102015205595 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * example 1 *; | [A]CN107640976 (NAT UNIV DEFENSE TECHNOLOGY PLA) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2019152861 (BOUILLON ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053]; claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH02296770 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-14 * claim 3 *; | [A]JP2000007453 (UBE INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-14 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2011122593 (IHI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1, 5 *; | [A]WO2014199459 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0019]-[0022] *; | [A]WO2016129591 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND AERO ENGINES LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0006], [0007] *; | [A]WO2018037617 (IHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1, 6 * | by applicant | JPH1059780 |