EP4046195 - ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICE FABRICATED ON A SUBSTRATE AND COMPRISING FERROELECTRIC LAYER EPITAXIALLY GROWN ON THE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Psiquantum Corp. 700 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Yong 700 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Nikhil 700 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Barton, Russell Glen Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/34] | Gillard, Matthew Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20876848.1 | 19.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US56365 | Priority number, date | US201962923413P | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962923413 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077104 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046195 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/035, G02B6/122, G02B6/13, G02F1/05 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
G02F1/035 (EP,US);
G02B6/122 (EP,US);
G02B6/131 (EP,US);
G02F1/0027 (US);
G02F1/05 (EP,US);
G02F1/0508 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H01L27/00, G02F1/00, G02B6/10, H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT HERGESTELLTE ELEKTRO-OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG, DIE EINE AUF DEM SUBSTRAT EPITAKTISCH AUFGEWACHSENE FERROELEKTRISCHE SCHICHT UMFASST | [2022/34] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICE FABRICATED ON A SUBSTRATE AND COMPRISING FERROELECTRIC LAYER EPITAXIALLY GROWN ON THE SUBSTRATE | [2022/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUE FABRIQUÉ SUR UN SUBSTRAT ET COMPRENANT UNE COUCHE FERROÉLECTRIQUE À CROISSANCE ÉPITAXIALE SUR LE SUBSTRAT | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006028477 (MASSACHUSETTS INST FOR TECHNOL [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,10,12 * figures 1-3 ** the whole document *; | [XI] - ORTMANN ET AL, "Optical and electro-optical phenomena in transition metal oxide thin film heterostructures", DISSERTATION UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN, (20190501), pages 1 - 197, URL: https://repositories.lib.utexas.edu/bitstream/handle/2152/75876/ORTMANN-DISSERTATION-2019.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20230501), XP055932640 [X] 1,10,12 * the whole document * * figure 7.10 * [I] 2-5,8,11,13-15 | International search | [Y]US2004150043 (HOLM PAIGE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * ; the entire document, and more specifically: para [0003], [0033]. [0035]. [0058]-[0059], [0064], [0066], [0068]; figures 1 and 5; abstract; title *; | [A]US7039264 (BRYAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * ; the entire document *; | [A]US9442314 (CUNNINGHAM JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * ; the entire document *; | [Y] - CUEFF et al., "Hybrid silicon-ferroelectric oxide platform for tunable nanophotonics on silicon", 18th International Conference on Transparent Optical Networks, (20160700), doi:10.1109/ICTON.2016.7550429, pages 1 - 4, XP032949943 [Y] 1-6. * (the entire document, and more specifically: pg 2, para 2-4; pg 3, para 2; pg 4, para 1; figures 1a, 3a and 3b; abstract; title) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTON.2016.7550429 | [A] - PERNICE et al., "Design of a Silicon Integrated Electro-Optic Modulator Using Ferroelectric BaTiO3 Films", IEEE Photonics Technology Letters, (20140700), vol. 26, no. 13, doi:10.1109/LPT.2014.2322501, pages 1344 - 1347, XP011551694 [A] 1-6 * (the entire document) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2014.2322501 | [A] - ROMEO Rojo, Hu X; Cueff S; Wague B; Orobtchouk R; Vilqui B; Bachelet R; Grenet G; Dubourdieu C; Regreny P; Saint-Girons G; Castera P; Gutierrez A M; Sanchez N; Angelova T; Sanchis P; Abel S; Fompeyrine J, "Integration of functional oxides on SOI for agile silicon photonics", 17th International Conference on Transparent Optical Networks, (20150700), doi:10.1109/ICTON.2015.7193606, pages 1 - 5, XP033191881 [A] 1-6 * (the entire document) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTON.2015.7193606 | by applicant | WO2006028477 | - ORTMANN et al., "Optical and electro-optical phenomena in transition metal oxide thin film heterostructures", Dissertation University of Texas Austin, (20190501), pages 1 - 197, XP055932640 |