EP4046264 - GATE DRIVER BOOTSTRAP CIRCUITS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyoung, Min 825 Reigh Count Pl. Cary, NC 27519 / US | 02 /
VEMURI, Satish, Kumar 4728 Fielding Drive Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | 03 /
WALDEN, James, Michael 112 Cypress View Way Apex, NC 27502 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH EMEA Patent Department Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20877086.7 | 19.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US56303 | Priority number, date | US201962923343P | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962923343 P | US202016801746 | 26.02.2020 Original published format: US202016801746 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077076 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046264 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/08, H03K17/042, H03K17/687, H03K17/06, H02M1/00, H02M5/458, H02M7/5387, H02P27/08, H03K17/689, // H02M1/42, H02M1/32 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
H03K17/06 (EP);
H03K17/567 (US);
H02M1/0006 (EP);
H02M1/0009 (EP);
H02M1/0012 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP);
H02M1/08 (EP,US);
H02M5/4585 (EP);
H02M7/53871 (EP,US);
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
H03K17/063 (EP);
H03K17/687 (EP);
H03K17/689 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H02M1/4208 (EP);
H03K2217/0036 (EP);
H03K2217/0063 (EP);
H03K2217/0081 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | H02M1/08, H03K17/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | GATETREIBER-BOOTSTRAP-SCHALTUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2022/34] | English: | GATE DRIVER BOOTSTRAP CIRCUITS AND RELATED METHODS | [2022/34] | French: | CIRCUITS D'AMORÇAGE DE COMMANDE DE GRILLE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2207257 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * figure 6 *; | [A]US2012013371 (NAKATAKE HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* figure 1a *; | [XAI]WO2012015427 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,23 * figure 3 * [A] 7 [I] 3,4,6,8,9 | International search | [Y]US2005100330 (SU GUI-JIA [US], et al) [Y] 33 * , abstract, figure 5 *; | [A]US2018309435 (SAKAI SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-34; | [A]WO2019026045 (INDIAN INST SCIENT [IN])[A] 1-34; | [XYA]US2019140637 (CHEN JING [CN], et al) [X] 23-25, 31, 32 * , paragraphs [0002], [0032], claim 12, figure 7 * [Y] 33 [A] 1-22, 26-30, 34 | by applicant | WO2012015427 |