EP4045147 - MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR TREATING VITILIGO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | For all designated states Junghans, Richard Paul One Lyndeboro Place Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2022/45] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE POOLE, I., Caroline 5716 Washington Street Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | 02 /
MUKHATAYEV, Zhussipbek 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | 03 /
JUNGHANS, Richard, Paul One Lyndeboro Place Boston, MA 02116 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20877375.4 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020US56104 | Priority number, date | US201962915945P | 16.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962915945 P | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021076980 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045147 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61P17/00, A61K35/17, A61P37/06, C12N5/07, A61K39/00, A61P37/00, C07K14/725, C07K16/30, C12N5/0783 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61P17/00 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/46433 (EP,US);
A61K39/464471 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP);
C07K16/3084 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | A61P17/00, A61K35/17, A61P37/06, C12N5/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VITILIGO | [2022/34] | English: | MATERIALS AND METHODS FOR TREATING VITILIGO | [2022/34] | French: | AGENTS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DU VITILIGO | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 12.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |