EP3868788 - MULTI-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gao, Xin M2, Building 9, NO. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Niliang M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 02 /
LI, Hongjie M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 03 /
YANG, Cuima M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Fuyu M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 05 /
PAN, Xiujie M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Yunhui M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 07 /
HU, Dongmei M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | 08 /
GAO, Xin M2 Building 9 No. 78 West 4th Ring Middle Road, Fengtai District Beijing 100039 / CN | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 20878020.5 | 08.07.2020 | [2021/34] | WO2020CN100892 | Priority number, date | CN20191115236 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911015236 | [2021/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077806 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3868788 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/46, C12N15/13, C12N15/63, C12N5/10, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A61P31/14 (EP,CN);
C07K16/241 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/16 (EP,CN);
A61P31/18 (EP,CN);
A61P31/20 (EP,CN);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P35/02 (CN);
A61P35/04 (CN);
A61P37/02 (EP,CN);
C07K16/244 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2818 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/2827 (CN,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/70 (CN);
A61K2039/505 (KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/53 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | MULTISPEZIFISCHER ANTIKÖRPER, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2021/34] | English: | MULTI-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2021/34] | French: | ANTICORPS MULTI-SPÉCIFIQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET SON APPLICATION | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | Translation filed | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 12.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9222324 (XOMA CORP [US]) [Y] 1-14* The whole document, in particular, SEQ ID NO:7, Ex.1-3, Fig1b *; | [Y] - SCHOONJANS R ET AL, "Fab chains as an efficient heterodimerization scaffold for the production of recombinant bispecific and trispecific antibody derivatives", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS CO, US, (20001215), vol. 165, no. 12, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 7050 - 7057, XP002207879 [Y] 1-14 * The whole document, in particular, Fig.1 A-C * |