EP4065943 - RARE-EARTH DOPED THERMAL BARRIER COATING BOND COAT FOR THERMALLY GROWN OXIDE LUMINESCENCE SENSING, AND INCLUDING TEMPERATURE MONITORING AND MEASURING A TEMPERATURE GRADIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Central Florida Research Foundation, Inc. 12201 Research Parkway, Suite 501 Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOULIARD, Quentin 3218 Royal Street Winter Park, Florida 32792 / US | 02 /
GHOSH, Ranajay 2073 Wembley Place Oviedo, Florida 32765 / US | 03 /
RAGHAVAN, Seetha 4370 Bending Branch Lane Oviedo, Florida 32765 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 20878037.9 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020US54466 | Priority number, date | US201962940963P | 27.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962940963 P | US201962944390P | 06.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962944390 P | US202017034156 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: US202017034156 | US202017034065 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: US202017034065 | US202017034098 | 28.09.2020 Original published format: US202017034098 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021133454 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4065943 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/20, C09K11/77, C23C28/00, G01K13/08 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
G01K11/20 (EP);
C09K11/7768 (EP);
C09K11/7787 (EP);
C23C28/3215 (EP);
C23C28/345 (EP);
C23C28/3455 (EP);
G01K13/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | MIT SELTENEN ERDEN DOTIERTE WÄRMEDÄMMSCHICHT FÜR THERMISCH GEWACHSENE OXID-LUMINESZENZMESSUNG, EINSCHLIESSLICH TEMPERATURÜBERWACHUNG UND MESSUNG EINES TEMPERATURGRADIENTEN | [2022/40] | English: | RARE-EARTH DOPED THERMAL BARRIER COATING BOND COAT FOR THERMALLY GROWN OXIDE LUMINESCENCE SENSING, AND INCLUDING TEMPERATURE MONITORING AND MEASURING A TEMPERATURE GRADIENT | [2022/40] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE LIAISON DE REVÊTEMENT DE BARRIÈRE THERMIQUE DOPÉE AUX TERRES RARES POUR LA DÉTECTION DE LUMINESCENCE D'OXYDE À CROISSANCE THERMIQUE, ET COMPRENANT LA SURVEILLANCE DE TEMPÉRATURE ET LA MESURE D'UN GRADIENT DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6072568 (PATON NEIL E [US], et al); | [A]EP1818424 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US2009226326 (CHOY KWANG-LEONG [GB], et al); | [A]US2010086790 (SCHUMANN ECKART [DE], et al); |