EP4050688 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING FOLDABILITY OF SEPARATOR IN PRISMATIC SECONDARY BATTERY CELL MANUFACTURING EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innometry Co., Ltd. (Gwanyang-dong) 5F, Nexteye Bldg. 65, Dongpyeon-ro 13beon-gil Dongan-gu Anyang-Si Gyeonggi-do 13930 / KR | For all designated states Shin, Hyuk 1302-1403, 53, Dontansunhwan-daero 21-gil Hwaseong-Si Gyeonggi-do 18482 / KR | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Seung Gyu 401, 21, Gyeonggi-daero 1010beon-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18411 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Jin Il 201, 30, Gokseon-ro 49beon-gil, Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16670 / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Hyuk 1302-1403, 53, Dongtansunwhan-daero 21-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18482 / KR | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Reiser & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Weinheimer Straße 102 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20878644.2 | 27.04.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020KR05520 | Priority number, date | KR20190133321 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190133321 | KR20200050417 | 25.04.2020 Original published format: KR 20200050417 | [2022/35] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080101 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050688 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, B65H35/08 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H01M10/0459 (EP);
H01M50/403 (EP,US);
B26D1/185 (EP);
B26F1/20 (EP);
H01M10/0404 (EP);
B26D2001/006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FALTBARKEIT DES SEPARATORS IN EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PRISMATISCHEN SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEZELLE | [2022/35] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING FOLDABILITY OF SEPARATOR IN PRISMATIC SECONDARY BATTERY CELL MANUFACTURING EQUIPMENT | [2022/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'APTITUDE AU PLIAGE D'UN SÉPARATEUR DANS UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE FABRICATION DE CELLULE DE BATTERIE SECONDAIRE PRISMATIQUE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2022 | Translation filed | 24.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2005285583 (TDK CORP) [Y] 2-8,11-17 * [0047]-[0072] *; | [Y]KR20120022385 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-17 * [0032], [0042] 1-19 *; | [A]KR20120131269 [A] 1-17; | [Y]KR20160032888 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-17 * [0045]-[0049] 1-12 *; | [A]KR20160051347 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 | by applicant | KR101627061B |