EP4050648 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, RECTIFYING ELEMENT USING SAME, AND ALTERNATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Power Semiconductor Device, Ltd. 2-2 Omika-cho 5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-1221 / JP | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRAISHI Masaki c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
SAKANO Junichi c/o HITACHI, LTD., 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20879597.1 | 06.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020JP37858 | Priority number, date | JP20190193215 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019193215 | [2022/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079735 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050648 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/866, H01L23/433, H01L23/495, // H01L23/00, H02M7/219, H02M7/00, H01L29/417, H01L29/06 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01L29/7808 (EP);
H01L29/7813 (EP,CN);
H01L27/0211 (US);
H01L23/3135 (US);
H01L23/4334 (EP);
H01L23/48 (CN);
H01L23/49562 (EP);
H01L23/49575 (EP);
H01L23/49589 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L25/16 (CN);
H01L25/165 (US);
H01L27/0629 (CN);
H01L27/0727 (US);
H01L29/0619 (EP,CN);
H01L29/7811 (EP);
H01L29/866 (CN);
H02M7/217 (CN);
H01L2224/04026 (EP);
H01L2224/04042 (EP);
H01L2224/0603 (EP);
H01L2224/26145 (EP);
H01L2224/291 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/33181 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48245 (US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/73215 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L24/01 (EP);
H01L24/06 (EP);
H01L24/33 (EP);
H01L24/49 (EP);
H01L29/0638 (EP);
H01L29/41766 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/12035 (EP);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19105 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/291, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP); |
Former IPC [2022/35] | H01L23/48, H01L21/8234, H01L27/06, H01L27/088, H01L29/06, H01L29/78, H01L21/329, H01L29/866, H02M7/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, GLEICHRICHTERELEMENT, DAS DASSELBE VERWENDET, UND WECHSELSTROMGENERATOR | [2022/35] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, RECTIFYING ELEMENT USING SAME, AND ALTERNATOR | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ÉLÉMENT DE REDRESSEMENT L'UTILISANT, ET ALTERNATEUR | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2022 | Translation filed | 14.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2007110002 (FUJI ELEC DEVICE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* figures 1-6 *; | [I]EP0899791 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] - [0 91] , [0 92]; figures 6, 25 *; | [A]US2016260678 (SATO TOMOHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3-8 *; | [I]US2019043984 (SHIRAISHI MASAKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3-10 * paragraphs [0042] , [0 95] - [0102] - [ 128] , [ 136] - [0138] - [ 176] , [ 190] - [0195] - [ 212] , [ 213]; figures 1, 2, 5, 6, 8, 11-14, 17 * | International search | [A]JP2007110002 (FUJI ELEC DEVICE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * [0011]-[0015], [0019]-[0020], 1 *; | [A]JP2011507468 [A] 1-10* [0011]-[0024], 2-7 *; | [A]JP2016162948 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10 * [0036]-[0037], 5 *; | [A]JP2019033144 (HITACHI POWER SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE LTD) [A] 1-10 * [0016]-[0083], 1-6, 11-17 *; | [A]JP2019129656 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-10 * [0025]-[0073], 1-7 * | by applicant | JPH10215552 | JP2012174878 | JP2015116053 | JP2019033144 |