EP4050933 - QUALITY OF SERVICE MEASUREMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, AND USER PLANE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Telecom Corporation Limited No. 31 Jinrong Street Xicheng District Beijing 100033 / CN | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Song No. 31, Jinrong Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100033 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Peng No. 31, Jinrong Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100033 / CN | 03 /
BI, Qi No. 31, Jinrong Street, Xicheng District Beijing 100033 / CN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | Attfield, Andrew John Reddie & Grose LLP 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20879716.7 | 03.07.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020CN100081 | Priority number, date | CN20191114398 | 24.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911014398 | [2022/35] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021077797 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050933 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/364, H04L41/0894, H04L43/08, H04W24/08, // H04W24/10 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP,CN);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04B17/364 (EP,CN);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L43/08 (EP);
H04W28/0236 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H04W24/10, H04W24/08, H04B17/364 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | DIENSTQUALITÄTSMESSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG UND BENUTZEREBENENFUNKTION | [2022/35] | English: | QUALITY OF SERVICE MEASUREMENT METHOD AND DEVICE, AND USER PLANE FUNCTION | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE QUALITÉ DE SERVICE, ET FONCTION DE PLAN UTILISATEUR | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2022 | Translation filed | 27.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 16.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2019139752 (OFINNO LLC [US]); | [X]US2019253917 (DAO NGOC DUNG [CA]) |