EP3907815 - BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/45] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Yongjoon LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Myungki LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Jonghwa LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
CHOI, Yongjoon Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Myungki Daejeon 34122 / KR | |||
03 /
CHOI, Jonghwa Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20879896.7 | 22.06.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020KR08064 | Priority number, date | KR20190133805 | 25.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190133805 | [2021/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080113 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907815 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/647, H01M10/653, H01M10/613, H01M50/211, H01M50/242, H01M50/271, H01M50/207 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
H01M50/207 (EP,KR);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/244 (CN);
H01M10/653 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/0481 (EP,KR);
H01M10/613 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,KR);
H01M10/647 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/6554 (KR,US);
H01M50/209 (US);
H01M50/211 (EP,KR);
H01M50/242 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/45] | H01M10/6554, H01M10/647, H01M10/653, H01M10/613 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL UND BATTERIEPACK DAMIT | [2021/45] | English: | BATTERY MODULE AND BATTERY PACK INCLUDING SAME | [2021/45] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIES ET BLOC-BATTERIE L'INCLUANT | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2021 | Translation filed | 04.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 12.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008057392 (TAKAMATSU TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0028] - [0035]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3-9; | [A]DE102018133391 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]WO2019167689 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR20140016326 (LI TEC BATTERY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* See entire document. *; | [Y]JP2018056112 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0017], [0044] and [0045] and figure 2. *; | [Y]WO2019088625 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See page 5, lines 13-16, page 19, lines 23-30 and figures 4, 8 and 13. *; | [A]KR20190078521 (SK INNOVATION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0060]-[0062], [0084] and [0091] and figures 1 and 7a-8. *; | [Y]KR20190106060 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 3 * See paragraph [0043] and figures 1-3. * |