EP4048863 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANALYZING CASING BONDING IN A WELL USING RADIAL SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConocoPhillips Company 925 N. Eldridge Parkway Houston, Texas 77079 / US | For all designated states Pipelines 2 Data (P2D) Limited 3 Minto Place Altens Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB12 3SN / GB | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEL, Geoff c/o Pipelines 2 Data (P2D) Limited 3 Minto Place Altens Aberdeen AB12 3SN / GB | 02 /
WALSH, Mark c/o Pipelines 2 Data (P2D) Limited 3 Minto Place Altens Aberdeen AB12 3SN / GB | 03 /
MAYO, Stephen John c/o Pipelines 2 Data (P2D) Limited 3 Minto Place Altens Aberdeen AB12 3SN / GB | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20880242.1 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US57344 | Priority number, date | US201962926228P | 25.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962926228 P | US201962926243P | 25.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962926243 P | US202063032240P | 29.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063032240 P | US202063094258P | 20.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063094258 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021081492 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048863 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/14, E21B44/00, E21B47/00, E21B47/10, E21B47/12 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
E21B47/005 (EP,US);
E21B33/134 (US);
E21B47/085 (US);
E21B47/095 (US);
E21B47/107 (EP);
G01V1/284 (US);
G01V1/306 (US);
G01V1/40 (US);
G01V1/46 (US);
G01V1/50 (EP,US);
G10L25/18 (US);
G10L25/51 (US);
E21B2200/20 (EP);
E21B2200/22 (US);
G01V1/52 (EP);
G01V2200/10 (US);
G01V2210/1214 (EP);
G01V2210/1299 (EP);
G01V2210/1429 (EP);
G01V2210/24 (EP);
G01V2210/41 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM ANALYSIEREN DER GEHÄUSEBINDUNG IN EINEM BOHRLOCH UNTER VERWENDUNG VON RADIALER ABTASTUNG | [2022/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANALYZING CASING BONDING IN A WELL USING RADIAL SENSING | [2022/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'ANALYSE DE LIAISON DE TUBAGE DANS UN PUITS À L'AIDE D'UNE DÉTECTION RADIALE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018003843 (HORI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2018176024 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2010038079 (GREENAWAY ROBERT [GB]) [A] 1-4, 17-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2016299050 (DOROVSKY VITALY NIKOLAEVICH [RU], et al) [A] 1-4, 17-20 * entire document *; | [X]US2018031723 (PRZEBINDOWSKA ANNA [DE], et al) [X] 17 * entire document *; | [A]US2018073353 (MALIK OSMAN S [CA], et al) [A] 1-4, 17-20* entire document *; | [A]WO2019118189 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-4, 17-20 * entire document * | by applicant | US2018003843 | WO2018176024 |