EP4053151 - KERATIN BD-1, PREPARATION METHOD, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUTE OF MATERIA MEDICA, CHINESE ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES ZHANG, Xubin No. 1 Xian Nong Tan Street Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Shishan NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Xiaoliang NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 03 /
QU, Jing NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 04 /
SHI, Guoru NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 05 /
FU, Jiang NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Ling NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 07 /
FENG, Nan NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | 08 /
XU, Shaofeng NO.A2, Nan Wei Road, Xicheng District Beijing 100050 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20880631.5 | 28.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020CN124325 | Priority number, date | CN20191128727 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: CN201911028727 | [2022/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083190 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053151 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/70, A61K38/17, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P25/08, A61P31/12, A61P9/12, A61K38/00, A61P11/10, A61P11/14 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
A61P31/12 (EP,CN);
C07K14/4741 (EP,CN);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/10 (EP,CN);
A61P11/14 (EP,CN);
A61P25/08 (EP,CN);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN);
A61P9/12 (EP,CN);
C07K14/47 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | C07K14/47, C12N15/12, C12N15/63, A61K38/17, A61P11/00, A61P29/00, A61P25/08, A61P31/12, A61P9/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | KERATIN BD-1, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/36] | English: | KERATIN BD-1, PREPARATION METHOD, AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2022/36] | French: | KÉRATINE BD-1, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, AINSI QUE COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE ET UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN104490929 (LIN PING) [X] 1-5,7,14,15 * paragraph [0004]; examples 1-9; claims 1-10 *; | [XY] - Anonymous, "Keratin 31 (Bos taurus)", UniProtKB, (20060822), Database accession no. Q148I8, URL: https://www.uniprot.org/uniprotkb/Q148I8/entry, XP093090942 [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * [Y] 6,8-13 | [X] - Anonymous, "Keratin 31 (Ovis aries)", UniProtKB, (20080318), Database accession no. B0LKP0, URL: https://www.uniprot.org/uniprotkb/B0LKP0/entry, XP093091044 [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * | [Y] - GAO FEIYAN ET AL, "Recombinant Human Hair Keratin Nanoparticles Accelerate Dermal Wound Healing", APPLIED MATERIALS & INTERFACES, US, (20190522), vol. 11, no. 20, doi:10.1021/acsami.9b01725, ISSN 1944-8244, pages 18681 - 18690, XP093088256 [Y] 6,8-13 * page 18682, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 18683, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsami.9b01725 | [A] - LIU RUI ET AL, "Peptidome characterization of the antipyretic fraction of Bubali Cornu aqueous extract by nano liquid chromatography with orbitrap mass spectrometry detection", JOURNAL OF SEPARATION SCIENCE, (20170125), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jssc.201600821, pages 587 - 595, XP093088820 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jssc.201600821 | [A] - WIENER DOMINIQUE JUDITH ET AL, "Novel Features of the Prenatal Horn Bud Development in Cattle (Bos taurus)", PLOS ONE, (20150520), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0127691, page e0127691, XP093088601 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0127691 | [A] - GUO TINGWANG ET AL, "Recombinant human hair keratin proteins for halting bleeding", ARTIFICIAL CELLS, NANOMEDICINE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20180406), vol. 46, no. sup2, doi:10.1080/21691401.2018.1459633, ISSN 2169-1401, pages 456 - 461, XP093088837 [A] 10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/21691401.2018.1459633 | [A] - BASIT ABDUL ET AL, "Health improvement of human hair and their reshaping using recombinant keratin K31", BIOTECHNOLOGY REPORTS, (20181028), vol. 20, doi:10.1016/j.btre.2018.e00288, ISSN 2215-017X, page e00288, XP093084619 [A] 10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.btre.2018.e00288 |