EP4053591 - RANGING SYSTEM, DRIVE METHOD, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Masahiro c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA, Akihiro c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION, 4- 14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20880864.2 | 14.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020JP38709 | Priority number, date | JP20190195195 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019195195 | [2022/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021085125 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053591 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/486, G01S17/10, G01S7/4863, G01S7/4865, G01S17/894 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
G01S7/4865 (EP,US);
G01S7/4802 (US);
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4863 (EP);
H05B47/115 (US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | G01S7/486, G01S17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNGSMESSSYSTEM, ANSTEUERVERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2022/36] | English: | RANGING SYSTEM, DRIVE METHOD, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TÉLÉMÉTRIE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | Translation filed | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 25.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017242105 (DUSSAN LUIS CARLOS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,14 * paragraphs [0003] - [0075] * [I] 5,8,9,13; | [I]US2019079172 (FIELD RYAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] *; | [I]US2019146071 (DONOVAN MARK J [US]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0034] - [0056] *; | [I]US10302746 (O'KEEFFE JAMES THOMAS [US]) [I] 1-15 * columns 13-15 * | International search | [Y]JPH1062550 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-19 * [0024] *; | [Y]JP2001221633 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1-19 * [0069], [0078], [0079], [0214], [0215] *; | [A]JP2003149338 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-19; | [Y]WO2014097539 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,4-5 * [0017], [0046] *; | [Y]US2015285623 (TACHIBANA MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 6 * 2, [0041] *; | [A]JP2018004426 (RICOH CO LTD)[A] 1-19; | [Y]JP2018119942 (CANON KK) [Y] 3 * [0032], [0043] *; | [Y]JP2018189443 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-19 * [0010]-[0036], 1-8 * | by applicant | JP2018004426 |