EP4018729 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAVING POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Taehyoung 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Jinkyu 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Youngbum 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Seunghoon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20882086.0 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020KR15071 | Priority number, date | KR20190137114 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: KR 20190137114 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021086128 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4018729 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04L5/00, // H04W72/04, H04W76/28 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H04W52/0235 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0212 (KR);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04W52/02, H04W76/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENERGIESPAREN FÜR BENUTZERVORRICHTUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAVING POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 23.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2019008491 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |