EP4051382 - ANKLE BRACE WITH ANTI-ROTATION FEATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryan, Kilbey, E. 54 Hugh Adams Drive Defuniak Springs, FL 32435 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | JENSEN & SON 366-368 Old Street London EC1V 9LT / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20882416.9 | 29.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020US57848 | Priority number, date | US201916666985 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US201916666985 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021087035 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051382 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/01 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
A61F5/0111 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | A61P5/00, A61F5/01, A61F13/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | SPRUNGGELENKSTÜTZE MIT VERDREHSICHERUNG | [2022/36] | English: | ANKLE BRACE WITH ANTI-ROTATION FEATURE | [2022/36] | French: | ATTELLE DE CHEVILLE AVEC ÉLÉMENT ANTI-ROTATION | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 15.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 15.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5795316 (GAYLORD ERIC LEE [US]) [X] 1-10,12-16 * figures 1-4, 9, 10, 14-22 * * column 6, line 10 - column 13, line 15 * [Y] 11; | [Y]US2019015234 (GAYLORD ERIC LEE [US]) [Y] 11 * figure 11 ** paragraphs [0038] , [0 89] * | International search | [A]US5472411 (MONTAG HANS-JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US6398750 (QUINN PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [X]US8821427 (WEBER JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9265642 (GIZA ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |