EP4052579 - PHYTOSANITARY COMPOSITION FOR USE AS A BACTERICIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lainco, S.A. Avda Bizet, 8-12 08191 Rubí / ES | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLESTA PEREZ, Jordi LAINCO, S.A. Avda Bizet, 8-12 08191 Rubí / ES | 02 /
LAVADO LLAMAS, Antonio Miguel LAINCO, S.A. Avda Bizet, 8-12 08191 Rubí / ES | 03 /
CORES ARAGUNDE, Hugo LAINCO, S.A. Avda Bizet, 8-12 08191 Rubí / ES | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20882595.0 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020ES70649 | Priority number, date | ES20190030950 | 29.10.2019 Original published format: ES 201930950 | [2022/36] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084147 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052579 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/28, A01N43/90, A01N25/04, A01N25/22, A01N25/30, A01P1/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
A01P1/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01N65/28 (EP,ES,IL,KR,US);
A01N25/02 (IL,KR,US);
A01N25/24 (IL,KR);
A01N25/30 (IL,KR,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,IL)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N25/04, A01N25/22, A01N25/30 (EP);
A01N65/28, A01N25/04, A01N25/22, A01N25/30 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/36] | A01N65/28, A01P1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Validation states | MA | 25.05.2022 | Title | German: | PHYTOSANITÄRE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS BAKTERIZID | [2022/36] | English: | PHYTOSANITARY COMPOSITION FOR USE AS A BACTERICIDE | [2022/36] | French: | COMPOSITION PHYTOSANITAIRE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE EN TANT QUE BACTÉRICIDE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | Translation filed | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 30.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH06116111 (NIPPON GETSUTOU KK); | [XY]US7192575 (RYAN ROBERT EUGENE [GB], et al); | International search | [X]JPH06116111 (NIPPON GETSUTOU KK); | [XY]WO0221926 (BARRIER BIOTECH LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]CN103828847 (SICHUAN LOMON BIO TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | by applicant | US2011171278 |