EP4051038 - PERSONAL SMOKING CESSATION DEVICE WITH AUTHENTICATION, ENCRYPTION, AND LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Coral IP Holding Company, Inc. 651 N. Broad Street, Suite 201 Middletown, DE 19709 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Xingchen 3 Spanish Moss Irvine, CA 92602 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Schlee, Alexander Richard Schlee IP International Maximilianstraße 33 80539 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20882895.4 | 17.06.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020US38219 | Priority number, date | US201962928998P | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962928998 P | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021086449 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051038 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/53, A24F40/65, A24F47/00 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A24F40/53 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/60 (KR,US);
A24F40/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/42 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/46 (KR);
A24F40/65 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | PERSÖNLICHE RAUCHERENTWÖHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG, VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UND SPERRE | [2022/36] | English: | PERSONAL SMOKING CESSATION DEVICE WITH AUTHENTICATION, ENCRYPTION, AND LOCK | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERSONNEL DE DÉSACCOUTUMANCE AU TABAC AVEC AUTHENTIFICATION, CRYPTAGE ET VERROUILLAGE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2016331035 (CAMERON JOHN [US]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0062] - [0064]; figures 1,9 * [A] 1-6,8-15; | [XYI]US2018093054 (BOWEN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0050] - [0051] - [0061] - [0063] - [0070] - [0071] - [0077] , [0082] - [0083] - [0110] - [0111] - [0122]; figures 1A-1C,2A,3 * [Y] 7 [I] 4,9-11,14,15; | [A]US2018110262 (BATISTA RUI NUNO [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0013] * | International search | [YA]US2016331035 (CAMERON JOHN [US]) [Y] 3-7, 9, 12 * para [0109], [0231] * [A] 14-15; | [A]US2017099879 (HEIDL JEREMY [US]) [A] 14-15 * entire document *; | [XYA]US2018093054 (BOWEN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-2,8 * para [0049]-[0050], [0070], [0077], [0093], [0094], [0122], [0127] * [Y] 3-7, 9-13 [A] 14-15; | [Y]US2018110262 (BATISTA RUI NUNO [CH], et al) [Y] 9-11,13 * para [0013], [0030], [0032] *; | [A]US2018116282 (DENDY CHARLES [US], et al) [A] 14-15* entire document * |