EP4051765 - PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR MAKING RECYCLE CONTENT HYDROCARBONS THROUGH A PROPYLENE FRACTIONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITTING, Daryl 1108 Stillmeadow Lane Longview, TX 75604 / US | 02 /
WU, Xianchun 3803 Clarkway Place Longview, TX 75605 / US | 03 /
SLIVENSKY, David Eugene SB-15 Lake Cherokee Tatum, TX 75691 / US | 04 /
POLASEK, Michael Gary 419 Woodway Lane Longview, TX 75605 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20882912.7 | 29.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020US57832 | Priority number, date | US201962928450P | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962928450 P | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021087026 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051765 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C10G7/00, C10G55/04, C10G57/00, C10G9/20, C10G1/10, C10G1/00, C07C11/06 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
C10G1/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C10G7/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G55/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C7/005 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C7/04 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G1/02 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G1/10 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G3/40 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G7/006 (US);
C10G9/00 (EP,CN,KR);
C10G9/06 (US);
C10G9/20 (EP,CN);
C10G2300/1003 (US);
C10G2300/4012 (US);
C10G2300/4081 (US);
C10G2400/20 (CN,US);
C10G9/36 (KR);
Y02P20/582 (EP,KR);
Y02P30/20 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C7/005, C07C11/06 (CN,EP);
C07C7/04, C07C11/06 (CN,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN MIT RECYCELTEM INHALT DURCH EINEN PROPYLENFRAKTIONIERER | [2022/36] | English: | PROCESSES AND SYSTEMS FOR MAKING RECYCLE CONTENT HYDROCARBONS THROUGH A PROPYLENE FRACTIONATOR | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES À CONTENU RECYCLÉ À TRAVERS UN DISPOSITIF DE FRACTIONNEMENT DE PROPYLÈNE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | 09.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012061005 (CONOCOPHILLIPS CO [US], et al); | [A]US2016264885 (NARAYANASWAMY RAVICHANDER [IN], et al); | [A]US2016264874 (NARAYANASWAMY RAVICHANDER [IN], et al); | [A]US2019055483 (BAFNA SHEETAL [US], et al); | [X]US2019177626 (RAMAMURTHY KRISHNA KUMAR [IN], et al) |