EP4053446 - LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichia Corporation 491-100, Oka Kaminaka-cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Norimasa c/o NICHIA CORPORATION, 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka- cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | 02 /
OKAHISA Tsuyoshi c/o NICHIA CORPORATION, 491-100, Oka, Kaminaka- cho Anan-shi, Tokushima 774-8601 / JP | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20883099.2 | 09.09.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020JP34188 | Priority number, date | JP20190197984 | 30.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019197984 | JP20200112022 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020112022 | [2022/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021084920 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053446 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/58, F21S2/00, F21V5/00, F21V5/04, F21V17/00, F21V17/10, F21V19/00, G02B3/00, G02B3/08 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H01L33/58 (EP);
F21V5/045 (EP,CN,US);
F21V13/04 (US);
F21K9/69 (EP);
F21V5/008 (EP,CN);
F21V5/048 (EP,CN);
G02B19/0028 (EP);
G02B19/0061 (EP);
G02B27/30 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | F21S2/00, F21V5/00, F21V5/04, F21V17/00, F21V17/10, F21V19/00, G02B3/00, G02B3/08, H01L33/00, H01L33/58, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENVORRICHTUNG | [2022/36] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE DEVICE | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE LUMINEUSE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | Translation filed | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006072885 (FRAEN CORP SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-7 * * page 3, line 20 - page 7, line 16 *; | [A]US2008030974 (ABU-AGEEL NAYEF M [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 4C * * paragraph [0066] *; | [XAI]US7580192 (CHU MAN YIN ARTHUR NEWTON [CN], et al) [X] 9,12 * figures 3,4 * * page 4, line 60 - page 5, line 13 * [A] 1-8 [I] 10,11,13; | [XAI]WO2013088299 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 9 * figure 4b * * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 8 * [A] 1-8[I] 10-13; | [XAI]WO2017202670 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 9 * figures 1-3 * * page 14, line 16 - page 19, line 8 * [A] 1-8 [I] 10-13 | International search | [YA]JP2016194568 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 10, 12 * , paragraph [0025], fig. 3, 4 *[A] 1-9, 11, 13; | [XYA]JP2018205349 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) [X] 9, 11 * , paragraphs [0013]-[0056], fig. 1-6 * [Y] 10, 12 [A] 1-8, 13 | by applicant | JP2010238837 |