EP4051214 - METHOD FOR TREATING SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUEWING, Sharon c/o Kao USA Inc. 2535 Spring Grove Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45214-1729 / US | 02 /
HACHIYA, Akira c/o Kao USA Inc. 2535 Spring Grove Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45214-1729 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20883293.1 | 30.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020US58178 | Priority number, date | US201962928734P | 31.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962928734 P | US202017082522 | 28.10.2020 Original published format: US202017082522 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021087239 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051214 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61F13/00, A61K9/70, A61M35/00, A61P17/02, D01D5/00 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
A61N5/0616 (EP);
A61K8/027 (EP,KR,US);
A61M37/00 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP);
A61K8/34 (EP,KR);
A61K8/35 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/7007 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/7015 (US);
A61M11/00 (EP,US);
A61N5/067 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR);
A61P17/16 (KR);
A61Q1/145 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/005 (KR);
A61Q9/00 (EP);
A61Q9/04 (EP);
D01D5/003 (EP,KR);
D01D5/0061 (EP,KR);
A61B18/02 (US);
A61B18/0218 (EP);
A61B18/042 (US);
A61B18/203 (EP);
A61B2018/00452 (EP);
A61K2800/28 (EP,KR);
A61K2800/83 (EP,KR);
A61M15/02 (EP);
A61M2037/0007 (US);
A61M2037/0061 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP);
A61M37/0076 (US);
A61N1/40 (US);
A61N2005/0651 (US);
B05B5/053 (EP);
B05B5/1691 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER HAUT | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING SKIN | [2022/36] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA PEAU | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2018296591 (YU BETTY [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11* paragraphs [0006] , [0 12] , [0 34] , [0 35] *; | [Y]WO2018194132 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 27] - [0031] - [0 72] - [0076] *; | [X]WO2018196044 (INFINITUS CHINA CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US2018317627 (FUKUDA IKUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9,11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 22] , [0 89] - [0093] * | International search | [A]WO0126610 (UNIV AKRON [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 10-12* entire document *; | [Y]WO2018097202 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6,10-12 * machine translation *; | [Y]US2018296591 (YU BETTY [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6, 10-12 * entire document *; | [A] - Rina Raphael, "This spray-on nanofiber 'skin' may revolutionize wound care", fastcompany.com, (20190706), pages 1 - 12, fastcompany.com, URL: https://www.fastcompany.com/90365782/this-spray-on-nanofiber-skin-may-revolutionize-burn-and-wound-care, XP055932153 [A] 1-6,10-12 * entire document * |