EP4040738 - MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Bing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Shuping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LI, Zhenbin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Xia Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20884921.6 | 28.07.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020CN105005 | Priority number, date | CN20191184038 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911084038 | CN201911426082 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911426082 | [2022/32] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021088433 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4040738 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L45/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04L45/34 (EP,CN);
H04L45/24 (US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP);
H04L45/64 (US);
H04L45/741 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | H04L12/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM | [2022/32] | English: | MESSAGE PROCESSING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2022/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGE | [2022/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2022 | Translation filed | 04.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9178816 (OJHA DEEPAK [US], et al) |