EP4054549 - TOPICAL FORMULATIONS OF CYCLOOXYGENASE INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smartech Topical, Inc. 10054 Prospect Ave Suite A Santee, CA 92071 / US | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HNAT, Thomas 11241 Provencal Place San Diego, California 92128 / US | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20885491.9 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020US59198 | Priority number, date | US201962931466P | 06.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962931466 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021092238 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054549 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/196, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K47/44, A61K9/06 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/192 (US);
A61K31/245 (US);
A61K31/405 (US);
A61K31/416 (US);
A61K31/60 (US);
A61K31/7034 (US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | A61K31/196, A61K47/10, A61K47/14, A61K47/44, A61K9/00, A61K9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE FORMULIERUNGEN VON CYCLOOXYGENASE-INHIBITOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2022/37] | English: | TOPICAL FORMULATIONS OF CYCLOOXYGENASE INHIBITORS AND THEIR USE | [2022/37] | French: | FORMULATIONS TOPIQUES D'INHIBITEURS DE LA CYCLO-OXYGÉNASE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 16.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011063531 (NUVO RES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 1-14; claims 1-77; tables 1-22 *; | [Y]EP2968214 (VAPOGENIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document ** claims 1-15 *; | [Y]WO2017173269 (SMARTECH TOPICAL LLC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 1-6; claims 1-15 * | International search | [XYA]WO2014143964 (VAPOGENIX INC [US]) [X] 1-3, 7/1-3, 8/1-3 * ; page 14, In 25-30; page 27, In 10; claims 1, 8-9, 12, 18, 20-21, 33, 35e * [Y] 4, 7/4, 8/7/4, 16-20 [A] 5-6, 7/5-6, 8/7/5-6; | [YA]WO2017173269 (SMARTECH TOPICAL LLC [US]) [Y] 17 * ; paragraphs [0050]-[0051] * [A] 5-6, 7/5-6, 8/7/5-6; | [YA]WO2018203040 (MEDHERANT LTD [GB]) [Y] 18 * ; paragraphs [0013]-[0014] * [A] 5-6, 7/5-6, 8/7/5-6; | [YA]US2019046438 (HNAT THOMAS [US]) [Y] 4, 7/4, 8/7/4, 16-20. * ; paragraphs [0019], [0068], [0072], [0096], [0102]; claims 1, 3, 4 * [A] 5-6, 7/5-6, 8/7/5-6; | [A] - OSBORNE, DW, "Diethylene glycol monoethyl ether: an emerging solvent in topical dermatology products", Journal of Cosmetic Dermatology, (20111200), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1473-2165.2011.00590.x, pages 324 - 329, XP055014454 [A] 1-8, 16-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1473-2165.2011.00590.x |