EP4033827 - POWER CONTROL METHOD, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING TRANSMISSION RESOURCES, TERMINAL AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Zhenshan No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
LU, Qianxi No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Huei-Ming 52 Tyrone Street South Yarra Victoria 3141 / AU | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Fassio, Valeria Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 20886127.8 | 18.08.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020CN109861 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN115434 | 04.11.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/115434 | [2022/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021088462 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033827 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/38 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04W52/383 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W52/242 (CN,KR,US);
H04W52/24 (CN);
H04W52/325 (KR,US);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W4/70 (CN);
H04W52/241 (KR);
H04W52/56 (KR);
H04W72/02 (CN);
H04W72/0473 (CN);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W72/231 (KR);
H04W72/232 (KR);
H04W72/25 (KR);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W92/18 (KR,US);
H04W4/46 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | H04W72/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM BESTIMMEN VON ÜBERTRAGUNGSRESSOURCEN, ENDGERÄT UND MEDIUM | [2022/30] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETERMINING TRANSMISSION RESOURCES, TERMINAL AND MEDIUM | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA DÉTERMINATION DE RESSOURCES DE TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL ET SUPPORT | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2022 | Translation filed | 22.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |