EP4044441 - MULTIPLEXING CIRCUIT, INTERFACE CIRCUIT SYSTEM AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Ting Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Chen Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | 03 /
QIU, Yupeng Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/39] |
Former [2022/33] | 01 /
HUANG, Ting Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHU, Chen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
QIU, Yupeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20886977.6 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020CN127178 | Priority number, date | CN201911115273 | 14.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911115273 | [2022/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093683 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4044441 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4044441 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/02, H02J7/00, G06F13/40 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
H04M1/72409 (EP);
H04B3/02 (EP,CN);
H03H11/34 (US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/007182 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPLEXSCHALTUNG, SCHNITTSTELLENSCHALTUNGSSYSTEM UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2022/33] | English: | MULTIPLEXING CIRCUIT, INTERFACE CIRCUIT SYSTEM AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2022/33] | French: | CIRCUIT DE MULTIPLEXAGE, SYSTÈME DE CIRCUIT D'INTERFACE ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2022 | Translation filed | 29.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |