EP3989160 - PATHOLOGICAL SECTION IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2022/17] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, GUANGDONG 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jun 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Kezhou 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
YAO, Jianhua 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Xiao 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/17] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20887251.5 | 17.09.2020 | [2022/17] | WO2020CN115842 | Priority number, date | CN201911115369 | 14.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911115369 | [2022/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093451 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3989160 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G01N33/574, G06V20/69, G06V10/34, G16H30/40, G16H50/20, G16H70/60 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,CN,US);
G06T7/10 (CN);
G06T7/11 (CN,US);
G06T7/136 (CN,US);
G06T7/187 (US);
G06T7/70 (CN,US);
G06V10/34 (EP);
G06V20/695 (EP,CN,US);
G06V20/698 (EP,CN,US);
G16H10/40 (CN,US);
G16H30/00 (CN);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,CN,US);
G16H70/60 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
G06T2207/10056 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10061 (CN);
G06T2207/20036 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20081 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30068 (CN);
G06T2207/30096 (CN,US);
G06T2207/30242 (EP,CN,US);
G06V2201/03 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/17] | G06T7/00, C12Q1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON PATHOLOGISCHEN GEWEBESCHNITTBILDERN | [2022/17] | English: | PATHOLOGICAL SECTION IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE DE SECTION PATHOLOGIQUE, APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/17] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2022 | Translation filed | 12.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 21.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2014102130 (VENTANA MED SYST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11-15 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 14 * * page 18, line 11 - line 18 * * page 20, line 1 - line 5 * * page 21, line 21 - page 22, line 13 * * page 36, line 22 - line 31 * * page 37, line 1 - page 38, line 9 * * page 39, line 7 - line 20 * * page 40, line 13 - page 41, line 8 * * page 64, line 10 - page 65, line 22 * * table 2 * * figure 1 *[I] 4-7,9,10 |