EP4058573 - CHROMOSOME CONFORMATION CAPTURE FROM TISSUE SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phase Genomics Inc. 1617 8th Ave North Seattle, WA 98109 / US | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SULLIVAN, Shawn 946 NW 63rd Street Seattle, Washington 98107 / US | 02 /
REISTER MORRIS, Emily 6401 20th Avenue NW, Apt. 9 Seattle, Washington 98107 / US | 03 /
LANGFORD, Kyle 4202 Phinney Avenue N, Apt.4 Seattle, Washington 98103 / US | 04 /
LIACHKO, Ivan 5727 40th Avenue NE Seattle, Washington 98105 / US | 05 /
EACKER, Stephen M. 1111 S Nevada Street Seattle, Washington 98108 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20887534.4 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020US60511 | Priority number, date | US201962936042P | 15.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962936042 P | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021097284 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058573 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, B01J19/10, C12Q1/6806 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
C12N15/1003 (EP);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12N15/1003, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2523/301, C12Q2535/122 (EP);
C12N15/1006, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2523/301, C12Q2535/122 (EP);
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2521/501, C12Q2523/101, C12Q2523/301, C12Q2535/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | CHROMOSOMENKONFORMATIONSERFASSUNG AUS GEWEBEPROBEN | [2022/38] | English: | CHROMOSOME CONFORMATION CAPTURE FROM TISSUE SAMPLES | [2022/38] | French: | CAPTURE DE LA CONFORMATION DES CHROMOSOMES À PARTIR D'ÉCHANTILLONS DE TISSU | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 12.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.09.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CA2936089 (JACKSON LAB [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2016089920 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018245079 (LIEBERMAN AIDEN EREZ [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [XYI]WO2019005763 (PHASE GENOMICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document, in particular [0053] and claims * [Y] 1-15 [I] 4-14; | [XYI]US2019214106 (ZHENG MEIZHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 [I] 2-14; | [Y]WO2019217819 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA CHAPEL HILL [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document, in particular the claims *; | [XYI] - JENNIFER L CRUTCHLEY ET AL, "Chromatin conformation signatures: ideal human disease biomarkers?", BIOMARKERS IN MEDICINE, (20100801), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.2217/bmm.10.68, ISSN 1752-0363, pages 611 - 629, XP055155789 [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 [I] 2-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2217/bmm.10.68 | [XYI] - VIVIANA I. RISCA ET AL, "Unraveling the 3D genome: genomics tools for multiscale exploration", TRENDS IN GENETICS., NL, (20150701), vol. 31, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.tig.2015.03.010, ISSN 0168-9525, pages 357 - 372, XP055534599 [X] 1,15 * the whole document, in particular Fig. 2 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 2-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tig.2015.03.010 | [Y] - CEJAS PALOMA ET AL, "Chromatin immunoprecipitation from fixed clinical tissues reveals tumor-specific enhancer profiles", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP US, NEW YORK, vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1038/NM.4085, ISSN 1078-8956, (20160425), pages 685 - 691, (20160425), XP037203007 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.4085 | International search | [Y]WO0053161 (ZYCOS INC [US], et al) [Y] 35 * entire document *; | [A]US2009186352 (AKOULITCHEV ALEXANDRE [GB], et al) [A] 1-44 * entire document *; | [A]US2011098342 (RAMADASS AROUL SELVAM [GB], et al) [A] 1-44* entire document *; | [Y]US2015161982 (LAUGHARN JR JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 18, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2015284709 (LAUGHARN JR JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 2, 6-17, 38 * entire document *; | [Y]US2016098516 (KIM IL-JIN [US], et al) [Y] 13, 14 * entire document *; | [A]US2016194713 (FRASER PETER [GB], et al) [A] 1-44 * entire document *; | [XY]US2019032113 (TROLL CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 36, 37, 39-44 * entire document * [Y] 2, 6-19, 35, 38 |