EP4059145 - MIXING COEFFICIENT DATA FOR PROCESSING MODE SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Boise, ID 83716 / US | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Fa-Long c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way Seattle, Idaho 83716 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20887606.0 | 16.10.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020US56146 | Priority number, date | US201916683223 | 13.11.2019 Original published format: US201916683223 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021096640 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059145 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00, H04B1/403, H04B1/401, H04B1/04, H04B7/08, H04L27/00, H04L27/26, G06N3/044, G06N3/08, H03M13/00, // H03M13/11, H03M13/27, H03M13/29, H04L25/03 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G06N3/044 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/401 (EP,KR,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,KR,US);
H03M13/6597 (EP,KR);
H04B1/0003 (EP);
H04B1/406 (EP);
H04B1/44 (KR,US);
H04B7/0851 (KR,US);
H04L1/0052 (US);
H04L25/0204 (KR,US);
H04W72/044 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
H03M13/1102 (EP);
H03M13/27 (EP);
H03M13/2957 (EP);
H04L25/03165 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | H04B1/401, H04B1/04, H04B7/08, H04L27/00, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | MISCHKOEFFIZIENTENDATEN ZUR AUSWAHL DES VERARBEITUNGSMODUS | [2022/38] | English: | MIXING COEFFICIENT DATA FOR PROCESSING MODE SELECTION | [2022/38] | French: | MÉLANGE DE DONNÉES DE COEFFICIENT POUR LA SÉLECTION DE MODE DE TRAITEMENT | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9942074 (LUO FA-LONG [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2005141632 (CHOI EOI-YOUNG [KR], et al); | [A]WO2006052501 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008004078 (BARRATT CRAIG H [US], et al); | [A]US2018227158 (LUO FA-LONG [US], et al); | [A]US2019326924 (TANIO MASAAKI [JP]) |