EP3920316 - SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited 2 Xin'gang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian PRC 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xiang No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Yulian No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Peng No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Shoujun No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Xinxiang No.2 Xin'gang Road, Zhangwan Town, Jiaocheng District Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
LI, Xiang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHENG, Yulian Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Peng Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
04 /
HUANG, Shoujun Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | |||
05 /
CHEN, Xinxiang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20887690.4 | 10.11.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN127908 | Priority number, date | CN201921982166U | 15.11.2019 Original published format: CN 201921982166 U | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093747 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920316 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3920316 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/529, H01M50/157, H01M50/159, H01M50/188, H01M50/197, H01M50/562, B60K1/04 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H01M50/188 (EP,KR,US);
B60K1/04 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/147 (US);
H01M50/157 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/159 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/197 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/209 (US);
H01M50/529 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/543 (US);
H01M50/562 (EP,KR,US);
B60K2001/0438 (EP,KR,US);
H01M2220/20 (KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | H01M50/147, H01M50/188 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE, BATTERIEMODUL UND VORRICHTUNG | [2021/49] | English: | SECONDARY BATTERY, BATTERY MODULE AND DEVICE | [2021/49] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE, MODULE DE BATTERIES ET DISPOSITIF | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2021 | Translation filed | 30.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | LU | 10.11.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2008027823 (DENSO CORP, et al) [I] 1,4-8,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,9,10; | [IY]JP2008027849 (DENSO CORP) [I] 1,4-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,9,10; | [A]US2014011074 (ODA YOSHIMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* Fig. 4 and corresponding text in the description; paragraph [0099]; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]US2018083302 (KOO MIN-SEOK [KR], et al) [Y] 2,3 * Fig. 3 and corresponding text in the description;; figures 1-6 * [A] 1,4-15; | [IY] - CHUNG EUN HYUK ET AL, "Adhesion of Poly(phenylene sulfide) Resin with Polymeric Film of Triazine Thiol on Aluminum Surface Modified by Anodic Oxidation", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL NANOTECHNOLOGY, US, (201501), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1166/jbn.2015.2027, ISSN 1550-7033, pages 157 - 164, XP055915968 [I] 1,4-8,11-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1166/jbn.2015.2027 |