EP4059890 - LACTIC ACID ADSORPTION AGENT AND METHOD FOR REMOVING LACTIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikkiso Co., Ltd. 20-3, Ebisu 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-6022 / JP | For all designated states Tohoku University 2-1-1 Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIOKA Toshiaki c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY, 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 02 /
KAMEDA Tomohito c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY, 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
KITAGAWA Fumihiko c/o Nikkiso Co., Ltd., Kanazawa Plant, 3-1, Hokuyohdai Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-0177 / JP | 04 /
JIMBO, Yoichi c/o Nikkiso Co., Ltd., Kanazawa Plant, 3-1, Hokuyohdai Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-0177 / JP | 05 /
KONDO Masayuki c/o Nikkiso Co., Ltd., Kanazawa Plant, 3-1, Hokuyohdai Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa 920-0177 / JP | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20887893.4 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020JP41748 | Priority number, date | JP20190205426 | 13.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019205426 | [2022/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021095691 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059890 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/00, C12M3/00, B01J20/04, C12N5/071, B01J20/08, B01J20/30, C12M1/00, C12M1/34, B01J20/28, B01D15/36, C01F7/784, C12M1/12 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C12M25/02 (EP);
B01J20/041 (EP,US);
B01D15/363 (EP,US);
B01J20/08 (EP);
B01J20/2803 (EP);
B01J20/30 (EP);
B01J47/014 (US);
C01F7/00 (EP);
C01F7/784 (EP);
C01G3/00 (EP);
C01G53/00 (EP);
C12M23/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | C01F7/00, C12M3/00, C12N5/071, B01J20/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | MILCHSÄUREADSORBER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON MILCHSÄURE | [2022/38] | English: | LACTIC ACID ADSORPTION AGENT AND METHOD FOR REMOVING LACTIC ACID | [2022/38] | French: | AGENT D'ADSORPTION D'ACIDE LACTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION D'ACIDE LACTIQUE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | Translation filed | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3848115 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-4 * claims 1,2,3,7 * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069] * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] *; | [X] - LALIKOGLU MELISA ET AL, "Investigation of Lactic Acid Separation by Layered Double Hydroxide: Equilibrium, Kinetics, and Thermodynamics", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING DATA., US, (20151103), vol. 60, no. 11, doi:10.1021/acs.jced.5b00324, ISSN 0021-9568, pages 3159 - 3165, XP055913160 [X] 1-4 * 2. Materials and Methods; page 3160, column l * * 3. Experimental Section; page 3160, column l * * tables 1-3 * * Introduction; page 3159 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jced.5b00324 | [X] - S. RADHA ET AL, "Energetics of CO 2 Adsorption on Mg-Al Layered Double Hydroxides and Related Mixed Metal Oxides", THE JOURNAL OF PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY C, US, (20141203), vol. 118, no. 51, doi:10.1021/jp508678k, ISSN 1932-7447, pages 29836 - 29844, XP055714889 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * Experimental Methods, Synthesis; page 29837 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jp508678k | [X] - KAMEDA TOMOHITO ET AL, "New treatment method for boron in aqueous solutions using Mg-Al layered double hydroxide: Kinetics and equilibrium studies", JOURNAL OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150801), vol. 293, doi:10.1016/j.jhazmat.2015.03.015, ISSN 0304-3894, pages 54 - 63, XP093103622 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * 2. Experimental, 2.1. Preparation of Mg-Al LDH intercalated with NO3- or Cl-; page 55 * * table 1 * * 3. Results and Discussion, 3.1. Preparation of Mg-Al LDH intercalated with NO3- or Cl-; page 57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2015.03.015 | [T] - KAMEDA TOMOHITO ET AL, "Lactate adsorption by layered double hydroxides in aqueous solution and cell culture medium", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES A : PHYSIOCHEMICAL AND ENGINEERINGS ASPECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 612, doi:10.1016/J.COLSURFA.2020.125975, ISSN 0927-7757, (20201211), (20201211), XP086472663 [T] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.colsurfa.2020.125975 | International search | [YA]JPS58214338 (KYOWA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-3, 5 * page 3, lower right column, line 11 to page 4, upper left column, line 1, page 4, lower left column, lines 5-9 * [A] 4; | [A]JP2009178682 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al) [A] 1-5 * entire text, all drawings *; | [YA]JP2016036804 (KANAZAWA INST OF TECHNOLOGY, et al) [Y] 1-3, 5 * paragraphs [0023]-[0050], table 2 * [A] 4; | [PA]WO2020050068 (NIKKISO CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-5 * entire text, all drawings *; | [PA]CN111001375 (UNIV FUJIAN TECHNOLOGY) [PA] 1-5 * entire text, all drawings *; | [PA]JP2020184979 (NIKKISO CO LTD, et al) [PA] 1-5* entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | WO2015122528 |