EP4033340 - SESSION MESSAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEIJING BYTEDANCE NETWORK TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. Room B-0035, 2/F, No.3 Building No. 30, Shixing Road Shijingshan District Beijing 100041 / CN | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Xu Jinritoutiao Post Office, China Satellite Communications Tower, No.63, Zhichun Road Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20888387.6 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020CN128163 | Priority number, date | CN201911102853 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911102853 | [2022/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093777 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033340 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, H04M1/72436 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP,CN);
H04L51/23 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | G06F3/0481 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | SITZUNGSANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/30] | English: | SESSION MESSAGE DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DE MESSAGE DE SESSION, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2022 | Translation filed | 19.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2024 | 28.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011145744 (HAYNES THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0032] *; | [X]US2018331996 (ZHANG LILI [CN], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]CN109725975 (TIANJIN BYTEDANCE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]JP2019514083 (APPLE INC) [A] 4-6 * the whole document *; | US2022150195 [ ] (CHAUDHRI IMRAN A [US], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0220] - [0221]; figures 5A -5I * |