EP4053748 - METHOD FOR DATA PROCESSING IN NEURAL NETWORK SYSTEM, AND NEURAL NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | For all designated states Tsinghua University Tsinghua University Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAO, Bin Tsinghua University, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 02 /
YAO, Peng Tsinghua University, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Kanwen Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LIAO, Jianxing Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Tieying Huawei Administration Building, Bantian,Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
WU, Huaqiang Tsinghua University, Haidian District Beijing 100084 / CN | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20888862.8 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020CN130393 | Priority number, date | CN201911144635 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911144635 | [2022/36] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021098821 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053748 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G06N3/084 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,US);
G06N3/08 (CN,US);
G06N3/063 (CN);
G06N3/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM NEURONALEN NETZWERKSYSTEM UND NEURONALES NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR DATA PROCESSING IN NEURAL NETWORK SYSTEM, AND NEURAL NETWORK SYSTEM | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL, ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2022 | Translation filed | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9646243 (GOKMEN TAYFUN [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI] - WANG ZHONGRUI ET AL, "In situ training of feed-forward and recurrent convolutional memristor networks", NATURE MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, vol. 1, no. 9, doi:10.1038/s42256-019-0089-1, (20190901), pages 434 - 442, URL: http://www.nature.com/articles/s42256-019-0089-1, XP093002909 [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * page 434, column left, line 1 - page 438, column left, line 38; figures 1, 2 * * page 441, column left, line 32 - page 441, column right, line 16 * [Y] 5,12 [I] 6,7,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s42256-019-0089-1 | [Y] - YAKOPCIC CHRIS ET AL, "Extremely parallel memristor crossbar architecture for convolutional neural network implementation", 2017 INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS (IJCNN), IEEE, (20170514), doi:10.1109/IJCNN.2017.7966055, pages 1696 - 1703, XP033112253 [Y] 5,12 * abstract * * page 1697, paragraph I. Introduction - page 1700, paragraph VI. Simulation and results * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.2017.7966055 |