EP4041996 - SKIP-FIRE ENGINE SYSTEM FEATURING DIFFERENT TYPES OF OIL CONTROL SOLENOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins, Inc. 500 Jackson Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOLHOUSE, J. Steven 2561 S. County Road 550W Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | 02 /
SMALL, Steven John 1639 Maple Street Columbus, Indiana 47201 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | CSY Herts Helios Court 1 Bishop Square Hatfield, Hertfordshire AL10 9NE / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20890003.5 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US59033 | Priority number, date | US201962936682P | 18.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962936682 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021101716 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041996 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01M1/08, F01P3/08, F02D17/00, F02D41/00, F02D9/08, F01L1/18, F01L13/00, F02D13/06 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F01L1/18 (EP);
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP);
F01L2001/186 (EP);
F01L2013/001 (EP,US);
F01L2013/101 (EP,US);
F01L2301/00 (EP);
F01L2800/05 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | F01L9/10, F01M1/08, F01P3/08, F02D17/00, F02D41/00, F02D9/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | SKIP-FIRE-MOTORSYSTEM MIT VERSCHIEDENEN ARTEN VON ÖLSTEUERUNGSMAGNETEN | [2022/33] | English: | SKIP-FIRE ENGINE SYSTEM FEATURING DIFFERENT TYPES OF OIL CONTROL SOLENOIDS | [2022/33] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR À CYCLE D'ALLUMAGE SAUTÉ PRÉSENTANT DIFFÉRENTS TYPES DE SOLÉNOÏDES DE COMMANDE D'HUILE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 22.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2002189575 (RAYL ALLEN B [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-13 * paragraphs [0018] - [0029]; figures 1-8 * [A] 4 [I] 3,9,10; | [Y]US2013284133 (LANFRANCO CLAUDIO [IT], et al) [Y] 2,3,6,8* paragraphs [0003] - [0064]; figures 1-2 *; | [XAYI] - "Implementing DSF with fast single solenoid using GDi injector driver ED - Darl Kuhn", IP.COM, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20140926), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013164977 [X] 1,5,7,11-13 * page 1 - page 8 * [A] 4 [Y] 2,3,6,8 [I] 9,10 | International search | [A]US6307376 (ALEXANDER RANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2013192547 (BOWLER ALAN EDGAR [US], et al) [X] 1, 7, 12-13, 18-20 * , entire document * [A] 2-6, 8-11, 14-17; | [A]US2014158073 (DOERING JEFFREY ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 2-6, 8-11, 14-17 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016130430 (GALHARD GRASSI VINICIUS [BR], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2016215705 (HAIZAKI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2018100459 (DICKSON JONATHAN A [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document * |