EP4062218 - SYSTEM AND DEPLOYMENT METHOD FOR A FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY HAVING A BLOWABLE SECTION AND A NON-BLOWABLE SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 3642 E US Highway 70 Claremont, NC 28610 / US | [2024/21] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states CommScope Technologies LLC 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, NC 28602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUDDINGTON, Geoffrey CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 02 /
GONZALEZ BLAZQUEZ, Jose-Luis CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 03 /
DIEPSTRATEN, Patrick Jacques Ann CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | 04 /
BIRD, Neil Stewart CommScope, Attention: IP Legal Department, 1100 CommScope Place SE Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Parker, Andrew James Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20891192.5 | 20.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020US61525 | Priority number, date | US201962938037P | 20.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962938037 P | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021102272 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062218 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.05.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/52, // G02B6/44, G02B6/38 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/52 (EP,US);
G02B6/3825 (US);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/4458 (US);
G02B6/4471 (EP,US);
G02B6/3887 (EP);
G02B6/4457 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G02B6/44, G02B6/38, H04B10/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSETZEN EINER FASEROPTISCHEN STECKVERBINDUNG, DIE EINEN AUFBLASBAREN ABSCHNITT UND EINEN NICHT AUFBLASBAREN ABSCHNITT AUFWEIST | [2022/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND DEPLOYMENT METHOD FOR A FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY HAVING A BLOWABLE SECTION AND A NON-BLOWABLE SECTION | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPLOIEMENT POUR UN ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES AYANT UNE SECTION DE SOUFFLAGE ET UNE SECTION DE NON-SOUFFLAGE | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 21.04.2023 | Stay of proceedings | [2023/22] | 21.04.2023 | Stay of proceedings | [2024/02] | 01.02.2024 | Resumption of proceedings | [2024/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010178020 (GRIFFIOEN WILLEM [NL], et al); | [I]WO2018146470 (EMTELLE UK LTD [GB]); | [A]US2018299632 (VAN BAELEN DAVID JAN IRMA [BE], et al) | International search | [A]US5863083 (GIEBEL MARKUS A [US], et al); | [A]US2011305424 (PIERCE ANDREW ELIOT [AU], et al); | [A]US2013216191 (YAMAUCHI ISAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US9470850 (OTT MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018146470 (EMTELLE UK LTD [GB]) |