EP4095922 - TOUCH DISPLAY PANEL AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TONG, Kemeng No .9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
HE, Fan No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
FAN, Cong No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Junxi No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
YU, Chi No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20891411.9 | 01.04.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020CN82736 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN73237 | 20.01.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/073237 | [2022/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021147175 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4095922 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, G06F3/041, H10K59/40, H10K59/80 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0443 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0448 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/84 (US);
H10K59/121 (CN);
H10K59/122 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP,CN);
H10K59/352 (CN);
H10K59/353 (CN);
H10K59/40 (EP,CN,US);
H10K59/80515 (EP);
G06F2203/04111 (EP,CN,US);
G06F2203/04112 (EP,CN,US);
H10K59/12 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H01L27/32, G06F3/044 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSANZEIGETAFEL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/48] | English: | TOUCH DISPLAY PANEL AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2022/48] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE TACTILE ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2021 | Translation filed | 31.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2021 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108183110 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [A]EP3422163 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]); | [A]CN109240533 (WUHAN CHINA STAR OPTOELECTRONICS SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2019140030 (HUANGFU LUJIANG [CN], et al) | International search | [A]US2016202793 (KIM YEON TAE [KR], et al); | [A]CN105988613 (YE XIN TECH CONSULTING CO LTD); | [X]CN108054193 (WUHAN HUAXING OPTOELECTRONIC SEMICONDUCTOR DISPLAY TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108829283 (WUHAN TIANMA MICRO ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |