EP3957547 - DETECTION SIGNAL CORRECTION METHOD, MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE, AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIOKA, Yusuke Maebashi-shi Gunma 3718527 / JP | 02 /
AOSAKI, Yoshihiro Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 2518501 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMURA, Hiroyuki Tokyo 1418560 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Rings, Rolf Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20891422.6 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020JP47702 | Priority number, date | JP20200099632 | 08.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020099632 | [2022/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021250917 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957547 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3957547 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B62D15/02, H02P6/16, H02P6/17 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B62D15/0235 (EP);
B62D5/0463 (US);
B62D5/0409 (US);
B62D5/049 (EP,US);
G01L3/101 (EP);
G01L3/1435 (EP);
G01L5/221 (EP);
H02P6/16 (EP);
B62D5/046 (EP);
B62D5/0484 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DETEKTIONSSIGNALKORREKTURVERFAHREN, MOTORSTEUERVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKUNG | [2022/08] | English: | DETECTION SIGNAL CORRECTION METHOD, MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE, AND ELECTRIC POWER STEERING DEVICE | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION DE SIGNAL DE DÉTECTION, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2021 | Translation filed | 02.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | MT | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | IE | 21.12.2022 | LU | 21.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MK | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008273478 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2019142875 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0192]; figures 1-23 *; | [AD]JP2019144056 (NSK LTD) [AD] 1-9 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0177]; figures 1-27 * | International search | [A]JP2008087756 (NSK LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2006335252 (JTEKT CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2005147733 (FAVESS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]US2018319440 (ERNSTSON GERNOT [AT], et al) [A] 1-9 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2019144056 |