EP4067105 - OPTICAL ANTI-COUNTERFEITING ELEMENT AND OPTICAL ANTI-COUNTERFEITING PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhongchao Special Security Technology Co., Ltd No. 6 Xinghuo Road Science City Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | For all designated states China Banknote Printing and Minting Corp. Kaixuan Building, Jia. 143 Xizhimenwai Street Xicheng District Beijing 100044 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUI, Haibo No. 6 Xinghuo Road, Science City, Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Kai No. 6 Xinghuo Road, Science City, Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Jun No. 6 Xinghuo Road, Science City, Fengtai District Beijing 100070 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20891577.7 | 19.08.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN110023 | Priority number, date | CN201911184133 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911184133 | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021103670 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067105 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/328 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,CN,US);
B42D25/324 (EP);
B42D25/342 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/36 (CN,US);
B42D25/373 (EP);
G02B27/06 (EP);
G02B27/60 (EP);
G02B5/1814 (EP);
G02B3/0056 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERES OPTISCHES ELEMENT UND FÄLSCHUNGSSICHERES OPTISCHES PRODUKT | [2022/40] | English: | OPTICAL ANTI-COUNTERFEITING ELEMENT AND OPTICAL ANTI-COUNTERFEITING PRODUCT | [2022/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ANTI-CONTREFAÇON OPTIQUE ET PRODUIT ANTI-CONTREFAÇON OPTIQUE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2022 | Translation filed | 01.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |