EP4057610 - CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Xin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Gang Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Wei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 20891619.7 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020CN128035 | Priority number, date | CN201911209202 | 30.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911209202 | [2022/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104017 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4057610 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, G03B13/34, H04M1/02, H04N5/232 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN);
H04N23/50 (CN);
H04N23/55 (US);
G03B13/36 (EP);
G03B30/00 (EP);
H02K41/0354 (US);
H04M1/026 (CN);
H04M1/0262 (CN);
H04M1/0266 (CN);
H04M1/0277 (CN);
H04N23/54 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04N5/225, G03B13/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/37] | English: | CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/37] | French: | MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | Translation filed | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2013044382 (PHOON HONG WEI [MY], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * figures 1-10 * [A] 1-10,12,13; | [XYI]US2018321503 (BROWN ANDREW BENJAMIN DAVID [GB]) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 1-11 * [Y] 11,12 [I] 2-10; | [YA]US2019361225 (CHO SUNHO [KR], et al) [Y] 12 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0087] * * figures 1-12C *[A] 1-11,13 |