EP4067724 - HIGH PRESSURE TANK HAVING HOOP LAYER AND HELICAL LAYER WOUND THEREON AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 28.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotte Chemical Corporation 300, Olympic-ro Songpa-gu Seoul, 05551 / KR | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, You Jung 115, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34110 / KR | 02 /
KO, Young Koan 115, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34110 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dae Gun 115, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34110 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Won Young 115, Gajeongbuk-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34110 / KR | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20891815.1 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020KR16268 | Priority number, date | KR20190154076 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190154076 | [2022/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021107486 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067724 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/06 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
F17C1/06 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0609 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0621 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0665 (EP);
F17C2203/067 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2209/2154 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2260/011 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0168 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0184 (KR);
Y02E60/32 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKTANK, DER EINE RINGSCHICHT UND EINE DARAUF GEWICKELTE SCHRAUBENFÖRMIGE SCHICHT AUFWEIST, UND HESTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/40] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE TANK HAVING HOOP LAYER AND HELICAL LAYER WOUND THEREON AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [2022/40] | French: | RÉSERVOIR HAUTE PRESSION AYANT UNE COUCHE DE CERCLAGE ET UNE COUCHE HÉLICOÏDALE ENROULÉES SUR CELUI-CI ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | Translation filed | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2011185360 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5 * figures 1,3 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US2012024746 (OTSUBO HIROKAZU [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0061]; figure 7 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]US2017219165 (TAKEMOTO SHINICHIROU [JP]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0050]; figure 6a * [I] 2-4; | [XI]JP2018155302 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,5 * figure 4d * [I] 2-4; | [I]WO2019020597 (ENRICHMENT TECH COMPANY LTD ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1-5* figure 4 * | International search | [A]CN101855488 (MICHELIN SOC TECH, et al) [A] 1-5* See paragraphs [0056]-[0060] and figure 5. *; | [X]JP2015157449 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [X] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0032] and figures 1-5. *; | [X]US2018104916 (NISHIWAKI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0029]-[0039] and figures 1-4. *; | [A]KR20180108485 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0021] and figures 1 and 2. *; | [X]KR20180119956 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0038] and [0065] and figures 1 and 2. * | by applicant | JP2011163354 | JP6354846B |