EP4066298 - PROTON TRANSPORT MEMBRANES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, TN 37240 / US | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIDAMBI, Piran Ravichandran 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 02 /
PANTELIDES, Sokrates T. 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 03 /
O'HARA, Andrew 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 04 /
BAO, Deliang 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 05 /
MOEHRING, Nicole 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20892728.5 | 25.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020US62133 | Priority number, date | US201962941102P | 27.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962941102 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021108478 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066298 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/92, H01M4/94, H01M8/08 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H01M8/1041 (EP,US);
H01M8/103 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
H01M8/1058 (EP);
H01M2300/0094 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | PROTONENTRANSPORTMEMBRANEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2022/40] | English: | PROTON TRANSPORT MEMBRANES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USE THEREOF | [2022/40] | French: | MEMBRANES DE TRANSPORT DE PROTONS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011269629 (GIUSTINO FELICIANO [GB], et al) [A] 1-4, 10-12, 20-21, 31-32 * Entire document *; | [A]US8507147 (MOFAKHAMI ARASH [FR]) [A] 1-4, 10-12, 20-21, 31-32 * Entire document *; | [XA]US9534296 (MCALISTER ROY EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-4, 10, 12/10, 20-21, 31-32 * Entire document,. especially col 6 In 61-67; col 7 In 1-2; col 10 In 19-22; col 11 In 5-8; col 12 In 37-46; Fig. 2A . * [A] 11, 12/11; | [A]US9748581 (DIANKOV GEORGI [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 10-12, 20-21, 31-32* Entire document *; | [A]US2019076792 (DRYFE ROBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1-4, 10-12, 20-21, 31-32 * Entire document * |