EP4066293 - PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT, PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION MODULE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND POWER SUPPLY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEI, Naomichi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
HORIUCHI, Tamotsu c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yuuji c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
TAMOTO, Nozomu c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
HONDA, Tetsuya c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd., 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20893405.9 | 30.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020JP44414 | Priority number, date | JP20190215219 | 28.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019215219 | JP20200031165 | 27.02.2020 Original published format: JP 2020031165 | JP20200196723 | 27.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020196723 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021107158 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4066293 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/44, H01M50/20, H01G9/20 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H01G9/2077 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/2031 (EP,KR,US);
H01G9/2068 (US);
H01G9/2081 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/542 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENT, PHOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSELEMENTMODUL, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND STROMVERSORGUNGSMODUL | [2022/40] | English: | PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION ELEMENT, PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION MODULE, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND POWER SUPPLY MODULE | [2022/40] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, MODULE DE CONVERSION PHOTOÉLECTRIQUE, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET MODULE D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2011223704 (DOI KATSUHIRO [JP], et al); | [XYI]WO2013114733 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2019169615 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP ) | International search | [Y]JP2013004178 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [X]WO2013114733 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]EP3547339 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2019169615 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP ) |