EP4067530 - THERMOFORMED COMPONENT HAVING EXCELLENT COATING ADHESION, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. No. 885 Fujin Road Baoshan District Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Ning NO.885, FUJIN ROAD, BAOSHAN DISTRICT Shanghai 201900 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Hao NO.885, FUJIN ROAD, BAOSHAN DISTRICT Shanghai 201900 / CN | 03 /
HONG, Jiyao NO.885, FUJIN ROAD, BAOSHAN DISTRICT Shanghai 201900 / CN | 04 /
JIN, Xinyan NO.885, FUJIN ROAD, BAOSHAN DISTRICT Shanghai 201900 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20893836.5 | 28.09.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020CN118368 | Priority number, date | CN201911202456 | 29.11.2019 Original published format: CN201911202456 | [2022/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021103805 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067530 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C2/12, C22C38/18, C23C2/26, C23C2/40, B21D22/02, B21D22/20, C21D8/02, C21D1/18, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28, C22C38/32, C21D1/673, C21D1/74, C21D7/13, C21D9/46, C22C38/38 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
C21D1/18 (EP,CN,KR);
C23C2/12 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0278 (EP,KR,US);
B21D22/022 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D1/673 (EP,KR);
C21D1/74 (EP,CN,KR);
C21D6/002 (US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D7/13 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0242 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/0068 (KR,US);
C21D9/0081 (CN,KR);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C21/02 (KR);
C22C21/10 (US);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,CN,KR);
C23C2/26 (KR);
C23C2/40 (EP);
C23C2/405 (CN,KR);
C23C30/005 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | C23C2/12, C22C38/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | THERMOGEFORMTE KOMPONENTE MIT AUSGEZEICHNETER BESCHICHTUNGSHAFTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/40] | English: | THERMOFORMED COMPONENT HAVING EXCELLENT COATING ADHESION, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/40] | French: | COMPOSANT THERMOFORMÉ AYANT UNE EXCELLENTE ADHÉRENCE DE REVÊTEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | Translation filed | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP3070187 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]); | [A]CN106466697 (BAOSHAN IRON & STEEL); | [A]EP3354360 (POSCO [KR]) |