EP4065393 - FRONT SUSPENSION ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. 726 St. Joseph Street Valcourt, Québec J0E 2L0 / CA | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCIER, Daniel 649 Gosselin Magog, Québec J1X 3J9 / CA | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20894761.4 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020IB61238 | Priority number, date | US201962941976P | 29.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962941976 P | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021105954 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4065393 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/20, B62K25/16, B62K25/24, B62K25/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
B62K11/04 (EP,US);
B62K25/22 (US);
B62D21/11 (US);
B62K21/005 (EP,US);
B62K21/18 (EP,US);
B62K25/005 (EP,US);
B62K25/04 (EP);
B60G2200/13 (EP);
B60G2200/44 (EP,US);
B60G2204/129 (EP);
B60G2204/416 (EP,US);
B60G2206/10 (EP,US);
B60G2300/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | B60G3/20, B62K25/16, B62K25/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | FRONTAUFHÄNGUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/40] | English: | FRONT SUSPENSION ASSEMBLY FOR A VEHICLE | [2022/40] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE SUSPENSION AVANT D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 09.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE2820882 (JILLET DIDIER); | [XI]US4834408 (DE CORTANZE ANDRE [FR]); | [A]JPH01204888 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) | International search | [YA]FR2397317 (JILLET DIDIER [FR]); | [A]US4526249 (PARKER JAMES G [US]); | [YA]US4638881 (MORIOKA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]US2014251710 (JUAN CHING [TW]); | [A]US2016052591 (MICHAEL JEFFREY [US]) | by applicant | DE2820882 | US4834408 |