EP4069725 - INTERLEUKIN 15 FUSION PROTEINS AND PRODRUGS, AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immune Targeting Inc. 4305 Greenbrier Dr. Dallas TX 75225 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yang 4305 Greenbrier Dr. Dallas, TX 75225 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20895945.2 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020US63214 | Priority number, date | US201962944203P | 05.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962944203 P | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021113577 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4069725 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/54, C07K14/715, C07K19/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
C07K14/7155 (EP);
C07K14/5443 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US);
C07K2319/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | INTERLEUKIN-15-FUSIONSPROTEINE UND PRODRUGS SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/41] | English: | INTERLEUKIN 15 FUSION PROTEINS AND PRODRUGS, AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREOF | [2022/41] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION DE L'INTERLEUKINE 15 ET PROMÉDICAMENTS, AINSI QUE COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2019213517 (IMMUNE TARGETING INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8-15 * the whole document * * figure 1; claims 1, 14, 15, 18, 19, 21, 32; sequences 6,7 * [I] 2,4; | [T] - GUO JINGYA ET AL, "Tumor-conditional IL-15 pro-cytokine reactivates anti-tumor immunity with limited toxicity", CELL RESEARCH, SPRINGER SINGAPORE, SINGAPORE, vol. 31, no. 11, doi:10.1038/S41422-021-00543-4, ISSN 1001-0602, (20210810), pages 1190 - 1198, (20210810), XP037606825 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41422-021-00543-4 | [A] - QIYUE HU ET AL, "Discovery of a novel IL-15 based protein with improved developability and efficacy for cancer immunotherapy", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20180516), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-018-25987-4, XP055491167 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-018-25987-4 | International search | [Y]US5198359 (TANIGUCHI TADATSUGU [US], et al) [Y] 7* Abstract; Claim 5 *; | [Y]US2012177595 (WONG HING C [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 4-5, and 7 * . para [0010]-[0011], [0157], [0164], [0188], [0196], [0198]-[0205], [0217], [0230]-[0231], [0238], [0252], [0361], Claim 1, Claim 22, Claim 53b *; | [Y]US2013089516 (FRELINGER JOHN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-2, 4-5, and 7 * Abstract; Claim 15; Claim 16; Claim 20; Claim 24 * |