EP4070806 - PROPHYLACTIC OR AMELIORATING AGENT FOR ORTHOSTATIC HYPOTENSION, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Quality Institute, Inc. 11-8, Kanda-Mitoshirocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-0053 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Katsutaro Tokyo 101-0053 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Osha BWB 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Osha Liang 2, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20896562.4 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP44053 | Priority number, date | JP20190218216 | 02.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019218216 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111980 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070806 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A23L33/135, A61K31/702, A61K31/716, A61K31/721, A61K31/729, A61K31/731, A61K31/732, A61K31/733, A61K31/734, A61K31/736, A61K36/02, A61P9/02, A61P43/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
A61P9/02 (EP,US);
A61K35/747 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (EP);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A61K31/702 (EP);
A61K31/716 (EP);
A61K31/721 (EP);
A61K31/729 (EP);
A61K31/731 (EP);
A61K31/732 (EP);
A61K31/733 (EP);
A61K31/734 (EP);
A61K31/736 (EP);
A61K47/26 (US);
A61K47/36 (US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/716, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/721, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/729, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/731, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/732, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/733, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/734, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPHYLAKTISCHES ODER VERBESSERNDES MITTEL FÜR ORTHOSTATISCHE HYPOTONIE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/41] | English: | PROPHYLACTIC OR AMELIORATING AGENT FOR ORTHOSTATIC HYPOTENSION, AND COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME | [2022/41] | French: | AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE OU D'ATTÉNUATION DE L'HYPOTENSION ORTHOSTATIQUE, ET COMPOSITION CONTENANT CELUI-CI | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | Translation filed | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 02.12.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2008120713 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0004], [0046], [0052], examples 1, 2, 4 *; | [Y]WO2009066681 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * , abstract *; | [Y] - NAKAMURA, SADAKO et al., "Daily feeding of fructooligosaccharide or glucomannan delays onset of senescence in SAMP8 mice, Gastroenterol", Res. Pract., (20140602), vol. 2014, pages 1 - 11, XP055832248 [Y] 3-5 * , title, abstract, fig. 1-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/303184 | by applicant | JPH0447724B | JP5554994B | JP2019218216 | - AIRO TATEGAKI, "Health functions of lactic acid bacteria (Lactic Acid Bacteria and Human Health", Comprehensive Medicine, (20180000), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 8 - 19 |