EP4070949 - BARRIER PAPER, CONTAINER AND LID MEMBER CONTAINING SAID BARRIER PAPER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING BARRIER PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1-1, Ichigaya Kagacho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUKI, Shozo c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Fumihiko c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 03 /
WAKAMATSU, Motoko c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 04 /
HASEGAWA, Takayuki c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | 05 /
KASHIHARA, Tomomi c/o DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD., 1-1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8001 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20897567.2 | 26.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP43996 | Priority number, date | JP20190221462 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019221462 | JP20190221463 | 06.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019221463 | JP20200183695 | 02.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020183695 | JP20200183702 | 02.11.2020 Original published format: JP 2020183702 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021111973 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070949 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, B65D65/40 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
D21H19/82 (EP);
D21H19/824 (US);
D21H19/08 (EP);
D21H19/828 (EP);
D21H25/005 (US);
D21H27/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | SPERRPAPIER, BEHÄLTER- UND DECKELELEMENT, DIE DIESES SPERRPAPIER ENTHALTEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRODUZIEREN VON SPERRPAPIER | [2022/41] | English: | BARRIER PAPER, CONTAINER AND LID MEMBER CONTAINING SAID BARRIER PAPER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING BARRIER PAPER | [2022/41] | French: | PAPIER BARRIÈRE, CONTENANT ET ÉLÉMENT DE COUVERCLE CONTENANT LEDIT PAPIER BARRIÈRE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER BARRIÈRE | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | Translation filed | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 17.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59199899 (LOTTE CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,13 * page 40; figure 2 * * claims 1-12 *; | [X]JP2002166495 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 * * page 631 - page 633 *; | [X]JP2005053495 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,13,15 * figures 1, 2; claims 1-3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0006] *; | [X]JP2017149023 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0010] , [ 0017] , [ 0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] ** paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042] *; | [X]JP2017226186 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [X] 1,8,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 009] , [ 0072] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0061] , [ 0063] * | International search | [XY]JPS5571725 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 6, 8-12,15 * , claims, examples * [Y] 5; | [XY]JPS576534U (NIPPON FOIL MFG. CO., LTD.) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , claims, page 2, second paragraph, fig. 1 * [Y] 5; | [XY]JPS57149133U (OIKE IND CO., LTD.) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , claims (claim 1) * [Y] 5; | [XY]JPS5985748 (KANAE KK) [X] 1-4, 8-14 * , claims, fig. 2(a) * [Y] 5; | [Y]JPH1095462 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 5 * , paragraph [0012] *; | [XY]JPH11240535 (NIHON TETRAPAK KK) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , claims (claims 1, 10, 13, etc.), example 1 * [Y] 5; | [A]JP2003291296 (ISHIDA SEISAKUSHO, et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text *; | [XY]JP2004351739 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 7-14 * , claims (claim 1), fig. 1 * [Y] 5; | [XY]JP2006058408 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 6, 8-12 * , claims (claim 1, etc.), drawings * [Y] 5; | [XY]JP2008062990 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 6-13 * , claims (claim 1), drawings (fig. 1, etc.) * [Y] 5; | [X]JP2010264984 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * , claims (claim 1), example 1 *; | [XY]JP2012025439 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-4, 6-14 * , claims (claim 1), paragraph [0016], example 1 * [Y] 5; | [A]JP2012086858 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-15* , entire text *; | [A]JP2019147606 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , entire text * |