EP4073298 - CELLULOSE ESTER COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLOOM RESISTANT OR BIO-BASED PLASTICIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, KY 41042 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCGRADY, Christopher c/o Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | 02 /
LI, Rongfu c/o Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | 03 /
COMBS, Michael c/o Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Xiaowei c/o Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | 05 /
SUBRAMONIAN, Suresh c/o Ticona LLC 8040 Dixie Highway Florence, Kentucky 41042 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20897705.8 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020US64233 | Priority number, date | US201962946183P | 10.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962946183 P | US202063090360P | 12.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063090360 P | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119269 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4073298 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/00, D01F2/28, D04H1/425 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
C08L1/12 (EP,KR,US);
A47G21/18 (KR);
B65D1/0207 (KR);
B65D1/265 (KR);
B65D85/8043 (KR);
C08K5/0016 (KR);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/101 (US);
C08K5/103 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08L1/12, C08K5/0016, C08L67/00 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L67/04, C08L1/12, C08K5/0016 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L67/04, C08L1/12, C08K5/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | CELLULOSEESTER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, DIE EINEN AUSBLÜHUNGSRESISTENTEN ODER BIOBASIERTEN WEICHMACHER ENTHÄLT | [2022/42] | English: | CELLULOSE ESTER COMPOSITION CONTAINING BLOOM RESISTANT OR BIO-BASED PLASTICIZER | [2022/42] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ESTER DE CELLULOSE CONTENANT UN PLASTIFIANT RÉSISTANT À L'EFFLORESCENCE OU BIOSOURCÉ | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6235815 (LOERCKS JURGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-8, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2003100645 (AHMED SHARF U [US], et al) [Y] 2, 4, 8/(2,4) * para [0006], [0007] *; | [A]US2012077905 (CHEN CHANGPING [CN], et al) [A] 1-8, 20* entire document *; | [A]US2012202928 (LOOS ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-8, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013133549 (CONTERNO COSIMO [CH]) [Y] 3, 8/3 * para [0032], claim 14 *; | [Y]US2015210827 (YONTZ DORIE J [US], et al) [Y] 5-6, 8/(5,6) * abstract *; | [XY]CN108456407 (HEFEI DAHU WIRE & CABLE TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,7, 8/(1,7) * abstract, claim 5 * [Y] 2-6, 8/(2-6); | [X]US2019256613 (PECORINI THOMAS JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 20 * para [0003], [0125], [0135], [0143], [0175], [0187] * |