EP4075173 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT VALVE AND LIGHT VALVE MANUFACTURED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G2B Co., Ltd. 81, Deurimsandan 4-ro Cheongbuc-eup Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 17791 / KR | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Byung-Seok 710-803, 152, Gangseok-ro Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10415 / KR | [2024/45] |
Former [2022/42] | 01 /
YU, Byung-Seok 710-803, 152, Gangseok-ro, Ilsandong-gu Goyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 10415 / KR | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20898441.9 | 25.11.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020KR16785 | Priority number, date | KR20190164514 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190164514 | [2022/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021118113 | Date: | 17.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075173 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, G02B5/30, G02B26/00 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G02B26/026 (EP);
G02B5/20 (KR);
G02B26/004 (KR,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B5/3008 (US);
G02B5/3025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LICHTVENTILS UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTES LICHTVENTIL | [2022/42] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT VALVE AND LIGHT VALVE MANUFACTURED THEREBY | [2022/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE VALVE DE LUMIÈRE ET VALVE DE LUMIÈRE FABRIQUÉ PAR CELUI-CI | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2022 | Translation filed | 10.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 20.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2002214653 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JP2006064832 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]US2013208342 (CHEN XIAO-PING [US], et al); | [A]US2015362728 (TEI TAKAHIRO [JP]) | International search | [A]KR960014118 (HANKOOK GLASS INDUSTRIES INC.) [A] 1-7 * See pages 2-6 and claims 1-4. *; | [A]JP2002214653 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * See claim 1. *; | [A]JP2006064832 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [A] 1-7 * See claim 1. *; | [A]KR20150081274 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 1-7 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20180121123 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY [KR]) [A] 1-7 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [PX]KR102151969B (G2B CO LTD [KR]) [PX] 1-7 * See entire document. *** This document is a published earlier application that serves as a basis for claiming priority of the present international application. * | by applicant | US1951664 | US1955923 | GB433455 | US2041138 | US2290581 | US3625869 | US4270841 | US4442019 | KR920011659 | JPH06129168 | US5409734 | US6900923 | US7791788 | - A. NOSHAYJ.E. MC GRATH, Block Copolymers-Overview & Critical Survey, Academic Press, (19770000), pages 83 - 163 | - J. K. SEARS et al., The technology of plasticizer, John Wiley & Sons, (19820000), pages 966 - 1077 | - J. BRANDRUP et al., Polymer Handbook, John Wiley & Sons, (19890000), pages 379 - 403 | US20050038590 | US20050048264 |